|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/03/1951 | Ashford Works (In yard) | In shops: 1107, 31245 (late s1245), s1274, 31287, 31329, 31413, 31510, 31812/26/62, 31900/23/25, 32372 (new cyls.), 32502 (lined black), s2473 (being renumbered), 32467, 32525/65, 78597, 90226, 33039. In yard: s1178, 1335, 31789 (green), 31897, 33025, 31616, 31848. On shed for works 1174, 31408, 31461, 32486 (and 30793 for ELH). Scrap: 1157, 31160 (partly cut up), 1547, 1730, 31743, 31502, 32402, and being cut up 1443 an 32301. Building Shunting diesel-electric 15228-30 and a main-line diesel 10203. Twenty sets of frames for 4-6-2 to be built at Crewe, also many sets of all-welded side tanks for new B.R. standard 2-6-4T to be built at Brighton. Noted not renumbered: 1041, 1271, 1339, 1379. Ex shops 32523 (1 dome), 31405, 31785 (green), 31521, and lined black 31401 an 31825 (late s1825) | SLS/195108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1926 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 1789 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) | ||
28/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA) | ||
07/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 31789 | ||
07/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) | ||
31/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) | ||
05/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
07/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ashford (74A) | ||
11/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
18/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
21/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
12/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
02/12/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 31789 |