Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3518 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17561 Week
» 82515 Month
» 285179 Year
» 3312032 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1796 |
m/e |
07/1928 |
British Railways |
31796 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
U Boats |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 07/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 05/01/1964 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1796 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
02/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31796 |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
06/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C) |
|
|
13/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
01/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
05/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31796 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|