Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 198 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 1289 Week
» 8901 Month
» 75763 Year
» 1741139 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1815 m/e 12/1920
British Railways 31815 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1920
Withdrawal w/e Sun 26/05/1963
Service Life 42 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1920
RED   Redhill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BAT   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 01/04/1948
73D   Gillingham (Kent) w/e 06/12/1951
73A   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 01/10/1953
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 8w/e 13/05/1954
70C   Guildford 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 26/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 8w/e 13/05/1954
ALLOC 70C Guildford P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 26/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1920 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1815
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED)    
01/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31815    
06/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
13/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
26/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31815    
07/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev