Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 137 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5668 Week
» 30502 Month
» 64834 Year
» 1730210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1817 m/e 01/1922
British Railways 31817 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 01/1922
Withdrawal w/e Sun 12/01/1964
Service Life 42 yrs , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1922
RED   Redhill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BA   Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 13/11/1948
RED   Redhill 8w/e 08/01/1949
BAT   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 25/02/1950
BAT   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 04/03/1950
74C   Dover Marine 4w/e 27/07/1951
75B   Redhill 4w/e 10/10/1955
     Withdrawn w/e 12/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RED Redhill 5w/e 11/08/1947
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC RED Redhill 8w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 04/03/1950
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 75B Redhill 3w/e 10/10/1955
WDN   w/e 12/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1922 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1817
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED)    
13/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
08/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (RED)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31817    
25/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
04/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
10/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
12/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31817    
02/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev