Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 132 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5663 Week
» 30497 Month
» 64829 Year
» 1730205 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1818 m/e 03/1922
British Railways 31818 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1922
Withdrawal w/e Sun 01/09/1963
Service Life 41 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1922
RED   Redhill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BAT   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 25/02/1950
BAT   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 04/03/1950
74C   Dover Marine 4w/e 27/07/1951
73J   Tonbridge m/e 10/02/1961
71A   Eastleigh 3w/e 26/05/1961
72A   Exmouth Junction 4w/e 01/02/1962
75D   Stewarts Lane on 11/08/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 01/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 04/03/1950
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 01/02/1962
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 31/08/1963
WDN   w/e 01/09/1963
ALLOC 75D Stewarts Lane 4w/e 16/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/09/1963 Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: 30073, 30824, 33037, 34006/15/21/33/41/51, 34043 partially cut up, 35014/7/8/25/7, 41316/24, 73049/51, 75069, 76010/28/68, 80015/31/42/82, D3668, D4100, D6536/45, E5007, E6001. Test House: 31834. Scrap Yard: 30510, 30911. Works Yard: 35010, WD601 ex works, 31400, 31846, 34036 damaged front end, 34055 (with smoke-box door from 34043), 35029, 73110 (all waiting works), 30915, 31818, 32338, 32635/61 waiting scrap. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1922 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1818
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31818    
25/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
04/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
01/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
11/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
09/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    
01/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31818    

prev prev