Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 122 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5653 Week
» 30487 Month
» 64819 Year
» 1730195 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1819 m/e 05/1922
British Railways 31819 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1922
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/01/1964
Service Life 41 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1922
DOV   Dover Marine on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75B   Redhill m/e 10/02/1961
75A   Brighton 5w/e 06/07/1961
70C   Guildford m/e 08/12/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 75A Brighton 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 08/12/1961
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964
TOSTORE   3w/e 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/01/1951 Ashford Works New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. SLS/195102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1922 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1819
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31819    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
06/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
08/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
05/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31819    
07/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev