Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 123 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5654 Week
» 30488 Month
» 64820 Year
» 1730196 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1820 m/e 08/1922
British Railways 31820 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1922
Withdrawal During 09/1963
Service Life 41 yrs , 1 mth

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1922
DOV   Dover Marine on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75B   Redhill m/e 10/02/1961
75A   Brighton 5w/e 06/07/1961
70C   Guildford m/e 08/12/1961
     Withdrawn m/e 09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 75A Brighton 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 08/12/1961
WDN   w/e 18/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/03/1951 Ashford Works (In shops) In shops: s1178, 1245, 1252, 31320, 31401/5, 31509, 31616, 31753/75/85, 31820/6/48, s1825, s1871, 32169, 2487, 32502/4/43, 33005/23/8, 78597. In yard : 1107, 1157, 31502/19/21/32, 1714/30, 31745, 31925, 32402, 2447, 32525, 32523/94, 33039, 90226. For scrap : 1443, 1547, 32301, 32584. Recently ex shops: lined black 31305, 31611, 31766/97, 31822, 32492, 32583.
No. 32553 ('C2x') has left Ashford after general overhaul, with two domes. There are still a number of boilers so fitted which are inter-changed from time to time, though the second dome has served no purpose since the top-feed arrangement with which it was associated by the L. B.& S.C.R. was discontinued in 1930 under Southern auspices. The ranks of the famous 'I.3' tanks are being rapidly depleted since the advent of the new Class 4 MT Tanks.
SLS/195104
11/09/1963 Eastleigh MPD (Waiting Works or scrap) Ex Works on 71A-DS238 (ex-30070 named Wainwright), 34030, 34102, 41290/5, 76007, D3719. Waiting Works or scrap on 71A-30065/89, 30199, 30241, 30346/68, 30500/3/11/5/6/9/48/86, 30911/30/6, 31403/13, 31637, 31794, 31810/20/79/80/90/8/9, 31900/3/5/6/10/6/21/3, 32353, 32417, 32557, 33011/21, 34023/35/71/4, 41312, 73054. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1922 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1820
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31820    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
06/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
08/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31820    
12/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev