Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 119 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5650 Week
» 30484 Month
» 64816 Year
» 1730192 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1830 m/e 06/1924
British Railways 31830 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/01/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1924
TON   Tonbridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
NORW   Norwood Junction 4w/e 01/04/1948
AFD   Ashford 9w/e 01/08/1948
FAV   Faversham 5w/e 04/02/1950
72A   Exmouth Junction 4w/e 09/09/1950
72A   Exmouth Junction 5w/e 09/10/1950
75A   Brighton 4w/e 22/10/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TON Tonbridge 8w/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC NORW Norwood Junction 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC AFD Ashford 9w/e 01/08/1948
ALLOC FAV Faversham 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 09/10/1950
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 22/10/1962
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/02/1962 Ashford Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: 31638, 31828/51/62/95. Works Yard: 30804/52, 30900/9/15, 31317, 31584, 31717, 31830/42/66/75, 32416. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1924 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1830
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
01/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (NORW)    
01/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (AFD)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31830    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (FAV)    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
09/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
22/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
05/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31830    
04/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev