Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 116 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5647 Week
» 30481 Month
» 64813 Year
» 1730189 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1831 m/e 07/1924
British Railways 31831 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sun 25/04/1965
Service Life 40 yrs, 9 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1924
FRA   Fratton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
EXJ   Exmouth Junction 5w/e 13/11/1948
RED   Redhill 5w/e 04/02/1950
72A   Exmouth Junction 4w/e 09/09/1950
72A   Exmouth Junction 5w/e 09/10/1950
75A   Brighton 4w/e 22/10/1962
75B   Redhill m/e 06/01/1964
70C   Guildford 4w/e 18/01/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 25/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRA Fratton P 01/12/1947
TOSTORE FRA Fratton 4w/e 06/10/1948
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 5w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC RED Redhill 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 09/10/1950
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 22/10/1962
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 29/12/1963
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 18/01/1965
WDN   w/e 25/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1947 Ashford Works No. 1783 has been equipped with a short circuiting bar for use during emergency on third rail. This is housed in a box attached to the back of the tender; the tender number is on the box. Conversion of 1831 to oil burning is going ahead fairly rapidly. The tender is completed and engine about half-ready. SLS/194709
03/01/1950 Ashford Works Locomotives in Works on 3/1 included Nos. 1266/67/93, 1309/24, 1553, 31610. 1623/72, 31729, 1783/93, 31806, 1807, 31831/63, 1864. Locomotives ex Works (late December-early January) painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 31145, 31811/38, 32465. 32585. 'D.3' No. 32380 is expected to appear in lined black, as also have Nos. 32388/93 recently, so it would appear that complete extinction of this class is not at present contemplated. SLS/195002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1924 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1831
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Fratton (FRA)    
13/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31831    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (RED)    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
09/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
22/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
18/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
25/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 31831    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev