Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 123 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5654 Week
» 30488 Month
» 64820 Year
» 1730196 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1842 m/e 08/1924
British Railways 31842 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/09/1965
Service Life 41 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1924
EXJ   Exmouth Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BPL   Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 12/03/1949
72A   Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
72E   Barnstaple Junction 9w/e 30/06/1952
72A   Exmouth Junction 5w/e 11/12/1952
72E   Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 18/06/1954
72A   Exmouth Junction 5w/e 11/03/1955
72E   Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 21/06/1955
72A   Exmouth Junction 3w/e 17/11/1956
70C   Guildford on 14/06/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 05/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BPL Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 9w/e 11/12/1952
ALLOC 72E Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 22/06/1954
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 11/03/1955
ALLOC 72E Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 17/11/1956
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 20/07/1964
WDN   w/e 05/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/02/1962 Ashford Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: 31638, 31828/51/62/95. Works Yard: 30804/52, 30900/9/15, 31317, 31584, 31717, 31830/42/66/75, 32416. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1924 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1842
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31842    
12/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (BPL)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
11/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
18/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
11/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
14/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
05/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 31842    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev