Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 132 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5663 Week
» 30497 Month
» 64829 Year
» 1730205 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1861 m/e 06/1925
British Railways 31861 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/05/1963
Service Life 37 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1925
RDG   Reading (S.R.) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73A   Stewarts Lane 7w/e 22/04/1950
74A   Ashford 3w/e 10/06/1950
74A   Ashford 4w/e 17/06/1950
75B   Redhill 4w/e 05/02/1951
73C   Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951
75B   Redhill 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 05/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 74A Ashford 3w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 74A Ashford 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 75B Redhill P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 05/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/05/1963 Eastligh MPD (Waiting Works) Waiting Works: DS682, 30031/65/70/89, 30105/10/99, 30328, 30513/39, 30936, 31612, 31861/6, 31906/8/9, 32503, 33009, 34046/84, 35012, 76013/4. Ex Works: D6527, 31803/53, 35004, 82023. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1861
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Reading (S.R.) (RDG)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31861    
22/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
10/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
05/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31861    
06/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev