Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 106 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3619 Week
» 23912 Month
» 201816 Year
» 1867192 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1865 m/e 06/1925
British Railways 31865 y/e 1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1925
Withdrawal During 09/1963
Service Life 38 yrs , 3 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1925
BA   Bricklayers Arms on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn m/e 09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HIT Hither Green 8w/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms m/e 30/06/1947
WDN   w/e 25/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1865
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31865    
09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31865    
03/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev