Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 38 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4015 Week
» 15252 Month
» 248172 Year
» 1913548 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1866 m/e 05/1925
British Railways 31866 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/01/1966
Service Life 40 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1966 at Cohens (at Eastleigh Depot)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1925
ELH   Eastleigh on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A   Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/11/1950
72A   Exmouth Junction 3w/e 30/11/1950
75B   Redhill 4w/e 11/04/1951
75B   Redhill 4w/e 13/04/1951
70C   Guildford 4w/e 18/01/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 09/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 18/01/1965
WDN   w/e 09/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/02/1962 Ashford Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: 31638, 31828/51/62/95. Works Yard: 30804/52, 30900/9/15, 31317, 31584, 31717, 31830/42/66/75, 32416. SLS/196204
12/05/1963 Eastligh MPD (Waiting Works) Waiting Works: DS682, 30031/65/70/89, 30105/10/99, 30328, 30513/39, 30936, 31612, 31861/6, 31906/8/9, 32503, 33009, 34046/84, 35012, 76013/4. Ex Works: D6527, 31803/53, 35004, 82023. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1866
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31866    
13/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
13/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
18/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
09/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 31866    
03/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: at Eastleigh Depot    

prev prev