Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1946 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19749 Week
» 72765 Month
» 192292 Year
» 3219145 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1866 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
British Railways |
31866 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Mongolipers |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 05/1925 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 09/01/1966 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
3w/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
75B |
Redhill |
4w/e |
13/04/1951 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
4w/e |
18/01/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/01/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/02/1962 |
Ashford Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 31638, 31828/51/62/95. Works Yard: 30804/52, 30900/9/15, 31317, 31584, 31717, 31830/42/66/75, 32416. |
SLS/196204 |
12/05/1963 |
Eastligh MPD (Waiting Works) |
Waiting Works: DS682, 30031/65/70/89, 30105/10/99, 30328, 30513/39, 30936, 31612, 31861/6, 31906/8/9, 32503, 33009, 34046/84, 35012, 76013/4. Ex Works: D6527, 31803/53, 35004, 82023. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1866 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31866 |
|
|
13/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
11/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
13/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
18/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
09/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31866 |
|
|
03/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: at Eastleigh Depot |
|
|