Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 164 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 1255 Week
» 8867 Month
» 75729 Year
» 1741105 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1867 m/e 06/1925
British Railways 31867 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sun 07/07/1963
Service Life 38 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1925
ELH   Eastleigh on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A   Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/11/1950
72A   Exmouth Junction 3w/e 30/11/1950
75B   Redhill 4w/e 11/04/1951
75B   Redhill 4w/e 13/04/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 07/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 13/04/1951
WDN   w/e 07/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/05/1951 Ashford Works In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. SLS/195107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1867
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31867    
13/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
13/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
07/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31867    
02/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev