Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 170 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 1261 Week
» 8873 Month
» 75735 Year
» 1741111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1868 m/e 07/1925
British Railways 31868 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/01/1964
Service Life 38 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1925
RDG   Reading (S.R.) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
RDG   Reading (S.R.) P 02/01/1948
73E   Faversham 7w/e 22/04/1950
75B   Redhill 4w/e 11/04/1951
75B   Redhill 4w/e 13/04/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HIT Hither Green 8w/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC RDG Reading (S.R.) P 02/01/1948
ALLOC 73E Faversham 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 13/04/1951
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/12/1948 Ashford Works Locomotives recently painted black and fully lined include Nos. 30520, 30916, 31005, 31507/95, 31765/74, 31804/50/68. SLS/194901
31/05/1964 Eastleigh Shed (Waiting Works or Scrap) Ex Works: D2283, 34079, 75005, 82019. Waiting Works or Scrap: 30029, 30036, 30048, 30052/3, 30102/7/8, 30480, 30512, 30546/8, 30667, 30837, 31626/9, 31797, 31864/8, 32646, 32650, 32662, 34047, 34065/7, 34073, 76028. Interesting Locos: 70017 (5A) Failed, 75016 (5E), 4951 (81F). SLS/196407

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1868
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Reading (S.R.) (RDG)    
02/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (RDG)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31868    
22/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
13/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
05/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31868    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev