Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 886 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 1904 Week
» 2843 Month
» 206333 Year
» 1871709 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1869 m/e 07/1925
British Railways 31869 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sun 02/08/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1925
EXJ   Exmouth Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75B   Redhill 4w/e 11/04/1951
75B   Redhill 4w/e 13/04/1951
70C   Guildford m/e 06/01/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 02/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 02/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/05/1951 Ashford Works In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. SLS/195107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1869
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31869    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
13/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
02/08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31869    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev