Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 105 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3618 Week
» 23911 Month
» 201815 Year
» 1867191 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1871 m/e 07/1925
British Railways 31871 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1925
Withdrawal During 11/1963
Service Life 38 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1925
EXJ   Exmouth Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
PLY   Plymouth Friary 9w/e 01/06/1948
EXJ   Exmouth Junction 8w/e 08/01/1949
PLY   Plymouth Friary 6w/e 12/12/1949
75A   Brighton m/e 30/11/1950
75A   Brighton 4w/e 08/12/1950
71D   Fratton 4w/e 05/02/1951
73B   Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 06/10/1951
73B   Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 08/10/1951
75B   Redhill 6w/e 14/06/1959
     Withdrawn m/e 11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PLY Plymouth Friary 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 8w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC PLY Plymouth Friary 6w/e 12/12/1949
ALLOC 75A Brighton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 71D Fratton 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 75B Redhill P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 01/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/03/1951 Ashford Works (In shops) In shops: s1178, 1245, 1252, 31320, 31401/5, 31509, 31616, 31753/75/85, 31820/6/48, s1825, s1871, 32169, 2487, 32502/4/43, 33005/23/8, 78597. In yard : 1107, 1157, 31502/19/21/32, 1714/30, 31745, 31925, 32402, 2447, 32525, 32523/94, 33039, 90226. For scrap : 1443, 1547, 32301, 32584. Recently ex shops: lined black 31305, 31611, 31766/97, 31822, 32492, 32583.
No. 32553 ('C2x') has left Ashford after general overhaul, with two domes. There are still a number of boilers so fitted which are inter-changed from time to time, though the second dome has served no purpose since the top-feed arrangement with which it was associated by the L. B.& S.C.R. was discontinued in 1930 under Southern auspices. The ranks of the famous 'I.3' tanks are being rapidly depleted since the advent of the new Class 4 MT Tanks.
SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1871
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
01/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (PLY)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31871    
08/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
12/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (PLY)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
08/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31871    
01/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev