|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/05/1963 | Eastleigh Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1931 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 1891 Built at Eastleigh Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN) | ||
05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 31891 | ||
27/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
07/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
11/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
20/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
10/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) | ||
17/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
06/04/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 31891 | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |