|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/08/1949 | Ashford Works | Ex Works: Class 'N' Nos. 31407, 31828/49, Class 'H.1' 31904 and DIE No. 15221. Yard shunting was performed by D/E No. 15220 and 'R.1' No. 31069. DIE Nos. 15222/23 are well forward, also a diesel-mechanical unit-Nos. 15224/25 will complete the current order, though it is believed a further lot are contemplated. The last 'F.1' No. 1231 was still intact and other engines in the yard were Nos. 1039/80, 1128, 1238/57, 31268, 1302/11, 31532, 1575, 31662, 1698, 31759, 31805, 1824/80, 31857/93, 1897, 1906, 31907, 1913/14, 2393, 2401/06/34/56/63/68, 2515/26/40, 33032, 34069. An interesting occupant of the shed was 'Terrier' K. & E.S.R, No. KES3. | SLS/194909 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1931 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 1893 Built at Eastleigh Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN) | ||
08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 31893 | ||
27/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
30/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
01/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) | ||
21/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Faversham (73E) | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Feltham (70B) | ||
08/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J) | ||
26/05/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) | ||
30/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 31893 | ||
05/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |