Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 893 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14299 Week
» 67315 Month
» 186842 Year
» 3213695 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1924 |
m/e |
02/1936 |
British Railways |
31924 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
W |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 02/1936 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 26/07/1964 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1936 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1924 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31924 |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
19/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
06/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
26/07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31924 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|