Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1867 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15273 Week
» 68289 Month
» 187816 Year
» 3214669 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2022 |
m/e |
03/1908 |
British Railways |
32022 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Marsh Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 03/1908 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 05/05/1951 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1908 |
TWW |
|
Tunbridge Wells West |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
05/05/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
05/05/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1947 |
Brighton Works |
: No. 21C156 Croydon and 'Austerity' 77122 have just been through shops; the former has the new pattern cab and longer deflector plates. Engines in shops in mid-November were 21C126 (new deflectors and old cab-off 21C156), 21C170 Manston fully painted), 680S, 1414, 1826/80, 2022, 2039 Hartland Point, 2083/9, 2153, 2339/66, 2436/43/55/62/89/90, 2523/46/75. For the first time for many months the shops are without an 'Austerity' and old Brighton types preponderate. It is interesting to point out that the name Croydon was borne by Rennie's 0-4-2 of 1838 (London and Croydon Ry. No. 2), but apart from this engine-which became S.E.R. No. 2 as from 31/1/1846-three engines of this name have been seen on Brighton metals as follows: Craven's 2-2-2 No. 128 which was commenced by Dodds & Son of Rotherham in 1866 and finished off at Brighton Works in June, 1871, and named Croydon by Mr. Stroudley: scrapped in 1888. Stroudley's 0-4-2 No. 181, built at Brighton (estd. Works No. 463), completed early in 1890 by R. J. Billinton, and scrapped in 1929. Bulleid's 'West Country' Class No. 21C156, completed in February, 1947, and modified in November to the 'Battle of Britain' Class (estd. Works No. 1004). |
SLS/194712 |
28/02/1949 |
Eastleigh Works |
'Merchant Navy' Class No. 35024 East Asiatic Company was ex Works painted blue, with red lining and carrying the British Railways crest on the tender. Locomotives ex Works during February, painted malachite green included: Nos. 30739, 30797, 30805, 30924, 34031/41/46/50/52 an 35013/29. Locomotives painted black and fully lined included:-Nos. 30673, 32028/79 an 32151, while those painted plain black included Nos. 32022/27. Several 'Schools' were awaiting boilers, which are being constructed at Crewe. |
SLS/194904 |
05/05/1951 |
Brighton Works |
42093 nearly finished by 5th May, 42094/5 an 80010-3 in various stages. 80010 is due out during the latter half of June, the next three being due in July. 2009 has been cut up and 32022 an 2062 are being dealt with next, followed by 2063 an 2068. All the 2-8-0 rernaining on SR register are re-numbered with the exception of 77150 (73C). . |
SLS/195106 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2022 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tunbridge Wells West (TWW) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32022 |
|
|
05/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
05/05/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32022 |
|
|