Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 2854 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16260 Week
» 69276 Month
» 188803 Year
» 3215656 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2029 |
m/e |
12/1909 |
British Railways |
32029 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Marsh Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1909 |
Withdrawal |
During 03/1951 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/01/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Locomotives in shops included:-Nos. 2039, 2325/39/51, S2376, 2514/20, S2578, 34004/15/56/64, 21C161/63, 'Austerity' 70853, 77062/90, 78597, while under construction were:-Nos. 34090, 36001 and tenders. No. 32029 which left shops on 1/1 with plain black tanks, came back to be fully-lined and was ex shops again on 5/1. 'British Railways' lettering on engines is cancelled. |
SLS/194902 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2029 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tunbridge Wells West (TWW) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32029 |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
03/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32029 |
|
|
03/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|