Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2113 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19916 Week
» 72932 Month
» 192459 Year
» 3219312 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2030 |
m/e |
03/1910 |
British Railways |
32030 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Marsh Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 03/1910 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1951 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
EBN |
Eastbourne |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
11/08/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/03/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Engines in shops included Nos. 82 Boxhill, 2023/30/37/39/76/89, 2113, S2343, 2449, 32086, 34001 Exeter, 34003/61, 73790, 77056, 77180, 21C107 Wadebridge. |
SLS/194904 |
30/04/1949 |
Brighton Works |
A reconditioned boiler (BE.926) has arrived at Brighton for 'H.1' class locomotive No. 32037 Selsey Bill, now undergoing heavy repair. No. 34065 Hurricane ('B.O.B.' Class) which was about to leave the works in the experimental light green livery, has been repainted in the old S.R. livery with yellow bands. Re-numbered at Brighton: Nos. 32023/30 (6/4); No. 34008 Padstow (8/4); Nos. 32113 an 90527 (ex 77056) (11/4); 32525 an 34009 Lyme Regis (13/4). No. 32151, ex Eastleigh Works, was noted lined out at Brighton shed on 10/4 and on 20/4 No. 31826 was observed here in the same style. |
SLS/194905 |
20/03/1950 |
Brighton Works |
Locomotives in shops for repair on 20/3 included: Nos. 15203, 31744, 32030/89, 32519/45, 32659, 34081, 36001, ex-W.D. 77098, 77321/79, 77460, 78531, 78666. Under construction Nos. 34106 Lydford (almost ready), 34107-09, and two 2-6-4 tanks. |
SLS/195004 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2030 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tunbridge Wells West (TWW) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (EBN) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32030 |
|
|
09/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32030 |
|
|
09/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|