Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1767 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19570 Week
» 72586 Month
» 192113 Year
» 3218966 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2079 |
m/e |
11/1910 |
British Railways |
32079 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Marsh Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 11/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 04/11/1950 |
Service Life |
40 yrs , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1910 |
3B |
|
Three Bridges |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
3B |
|
Three Bridges |
P |
02/01/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
04/11/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
3Br |
Three Bridges |
P |
02/01/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/11/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1949 |
Eastleigh Works |
'Merchant Navy' Class No. 35024 East Asiatic Company was ex Works painted blue, with red lining and carrying the British Railways crest on the tender. Locomotives ex Works during February, painted malachite green included: Nos. 30739, 30797, 30805, 30924, 34031/41/46/50/52 an 35013/29. Locomotives painted black and fully lined included:-Nos. 30673, 32028/79 an 32151, while those painted plain black included Nos. 32022/27. Several 'Schools' were awaiting boilers, which are being constructed at Crewe. |
SLS/194904 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2079 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Three Bridges (3B ) |
|
|
02/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (3B ) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32079 |
|
|
11/1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32079 |
|
|