Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 518 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18321 Week
» 71337 Month
» 190864 Year
» 3217717 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2095 |
m/e |
11/1883 |
British Railways |
32095 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
El Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 11/1883 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/11/1956 |
Service Life |
73 yrs , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1956 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
24/08/1953 |
ALLOC |
72D |
Plymouth Friary |
5w/e |
01/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/11/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1948 |
General |
Locomotives with smokebox number plates include: Nos. 30193, 30521/70, 30696, 30856/61, 30950, 32095, 34012/18. |
SLS/194808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1883 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2095 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barnstaple Junction (BPL) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32095 |
|
|
01/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D) |
|
|
1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
24/11/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32095 |
|
|