Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4059 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17465 Week
» 70481 Month
» 190008 Year
» 3216861 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2147 |
m/e |
10/1879 |
British Railways |
32147 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stroudley |
Class |
Black Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1879 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1951 |
Service Life |
72 yrs , 2 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1952 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
8w/e |
27/06/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/11/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1879 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2147 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32147 |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
12/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32147 |
|
|
10/1952 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|