Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 159 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17962 Week
» 70978 Month
» 190505 Year
» 3217358 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2160 |
m/e |
07/1891 |
British Railways |
32160 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stroudley |
Class |
E1-1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 07/1891 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1951 |
Service Life |
60 yrs , 5 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BAS |
Basingstoke |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/03/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2160 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 32160 but not taken up |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (BAS) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
11/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
12/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2160 |
|
|
12/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|