30/09/1947 |
Tunbridge Wells MPD |
'J' 4-6-2T No. 2325 is back at Tunbridge Wells. |
SLS/194710 |
02/12/1948 |
Brighton Works |
Locomotives in shops included:-Nos. 34056/64, both new green and lined (done at Eastleigh, in the summer), 20001 (ex CC1 to-day), 34088-90 (under construction), 36001 ('Leader'), 2325/39 an 32512 (ready). No. 34086, which ran trials at the end of November, is painted in the new light green and fully lined but not the panels, while the bottom of the engine and tender casing are all green and not black; the first one to be done here in this livery. |
SLS/194901 |
05/01/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Locomotives in shops included:-Nos. 2039, 2325/39/51, S2376, 2514/20, S2578, 34004/15/56/64, 21C161/63, 'Austerity' 70853, 77062/90, 78597, while under construction were:-Nos. 34090, 36001 and tenders. No. 32029 which left shops on 1/1 with plain black tanks, came back to be fully-lined and was ex shops again on 5/1. 'British Railways' lettering on engines is cancelled. |
SLS/194902 |
01/02/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Engines in shops:-Nos. 21C101, CC2, 34004/05/20, 34061 73 Squadron, 34062/65, 2039/76/89, 2325, 2489, 2514, 32339, 32520 an 77062/94, for repair. Two 'Leader' Class under construction. No. 34090 left shops on 31/1 named Sir Eustace Missenden, Southern Railway Battle of Britain Class, the S.R. Coat-of-arms is also incorporated in the nameplate, the background of which is painted Air Force blue. The locomotive is painted malachite green with yellow lining, but the wheel centres instead of being black are also green and the tyres yellow. The British Railways crest is on the tender. |
SLS/194903 |
30/06/1951 |
Brighton area workings |
L.M. type 2-6-4T's have been tried on Brighton-Salisbury round trips (over 160 miles), taking water en route, with the through Plymouth or Cardiff trains, and appear to have done well notwithstanding the heaviness of some of the loads. Re-coaling was doubtless effected at Salisbury. 'Ul' as well as LSW 4-4-0's also appeared thereon during the temporary shortage of 'Pacifics' on account of reallocations. Class '4' tank 42092 headed the Hastings-Manchester train as far as Brighton with eleven L.M. corridors from Polegate on June 30th, in charge of St. Leonards men who had not worked one of the type before but kept time. 42091 a few days before brought eleven corridor S.R. empty coaches from Ashford to St. Leonards. This train, weighing 375 tons full, was too tough a proposition on the following Saturday from Polegate to Brighton for an 'I3' 4-4-2T as speed up the arduous 1 in 88 of Falmer bank fell to 17 m.p.h., when forming Hastings and Eastbourne to Birmingham (Snow Hill) service. 'N' class 'Moguls' took over these 11-coach trains at Brighton for the run to Kensington or Redhill. In a plain dress of malachite green, a little faded, the once famous Brighton pioneer six-coupled express loco. named Abergavenny in her heyday, spending her last days as a solitary survivor of a famous tank regime-No. 32325 has been travelling round the Central Section on odd jobs but her last call has come, alas! Though withdrawn, she was still at Brighton shed on June 30th. |
SLS/195108 |