Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2269 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20072 Week
» 73088 Month
» 192615 Year
» 3219468 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2337 |
m/e |
09/1913 |
British Railways |
32337 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
L. Billinton |
Class |
Moguls |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 09/1913 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/12/1962 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1948 |
Brighton Works |
The following were noted at Brighton in standard black livery, unlined with Gill Sans lettering and smokebox numberplates: Nos. 30425, 30951 (no smokebox numberplate), 32077/84, 32337/44/49, while No. 30806 was in Southern green, with Standard Gill Sans lettering and smokebox numberplate. |
SLS/194811 |
31/01/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
ex Works: Blue, 35017/26/28; dark green, 30752, 30858, 34009/17/26/44/51/53/88/89; lined black, 30050, 30117/28, 30285/8, 30482, 30707/58 Lord St. Levan, 30909/28. B.4 dock tanks 30096/102 have lost their names on repainting. No. 32425 has been repaired here, also 32151 (lined black), 32331/7, 32558. The I.3 tank, 32076, appears to be waiting scrap. |
SLS/195103 |
06/11/1959 |
Southern Region floods |
4th-6/11/1959. Unique in that on the second day (Sat., Nov. 5th) as far as possible a half-hourly service was operated such as only scheduled or attempted with electric multiple-units introduced in 1935, was the emergency steam working between Brighton and Eastbourne calling at intermediate stations, on account of severe flooding through the two-sided junction station at the county town, Lewes, necessitating withdrawal of all electric trains for 2 or more days on the Brighton side; for more than a week on the Haywards Heath-London side. It was not possible for the steam locOrnotives as a rule to keep intermediate timings but it was a great effort by all concerned over steep gradients 'twixt Lewes and Brighton under hazardous conditions, for instance. Saturday loads were 4-5 bogies though on Friday with fewer trains up to 8-9 modern coaches were hauled on some trips presenting a tough proposition as the engines were of a mixed character with crews hastily gathered together. Some complete outfits were from the Brighton-Uckfield (Tunbridge Wells) route closed temporarily by other flooding. Mr. S. C. Nash kindly supplied the following list of locomotives sharing in the handling of the emergency passenger service, Nov. 4th-6th :- Tender: 34098 'West Country'; 30546, 'Q', 31686, 31724, 'C', 0-6-0s; 31825, 'N', 31902/7, 'Ul', 32337/41-2, 'K' ex-L.B.S.C.R., 2.6-0s; 75075, B.R. class 4 4-6-0. Tank: 30053/6 'M7' ex-L.S.W.R. motor fitted, also partly on Seaford branch; 80032/81/146/7/52-4, B.R. class 4 2-6-4T. There were also part time two Hastings-London 6-car diesel-electric sets having greater accelerative capacity. |
SLS/196102 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2337 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Fratton (FRA) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newhaven (NHN) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32337 |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
11/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (70F) |
|
|
26/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
05/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
05/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32337 |
|
|
05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|