Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 335 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18138 Week
» 71154 Month
» 190681 Year
» 3217534 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2348 |
m/e |
12/1920 |
British Railways |
32348 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
L. Billinton |
Class |
Moguls |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1920 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/11/1962 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 11 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2348 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastbourne (EBN) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32348 |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
13/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
14/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
20/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
27/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
08/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
10/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32348 |
|
|
12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|