26/09/1949 |
Dover MPD |
0-4-2T No. 2359 has been standing outside Dover shed for some time, apparently acting as a stationary boiler, and supplying steam to the shed. On 26/9 (Monday) it was still there, but it had gone by Wednesday, and was not replaced. On Thursday it was back in its old position, and in steam, with the external piping refitted. |
SLS/194911 |
25/02/1950 |
\"D.1/M\" and \"D.1\" Classes |
The withdrawal on 25/2/50 of 'D.1/M' Nos. 2215/34/74, which had latterly been in store at Eastbourne, leaves only one survivor of both the 'D.1/M' and the 'D.1' Classes, viz. Nos. 2252 an 2359 in service at Horsham and Dover respectively. There is also another member of the class in service on the Whittingham Asylum' Rly. |
SLS/195004 |
12/08/1950 |
S.R. Renumbering |
The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. |
SLS/195012 |
30/11/1950 |
General |
With the withdrawal of D.1m No. 2252 (Buckhurst, Neilson 2721, 12/81) none of this famous Stroudley 0-4-2T type remains in regular service, though 2359(D.1) is still on the register. No. 34036 has come out of Brighton Works in malachite green (re-touched) with emblem on tender, but still nameless. |
SLS/195012 |
01/03/1951 |
Dover Scrapyard |
Certain withdrawn locomotives have recently been scrapped at Dover in a yard belonging to Dover Industries Ltd. This yard is adjacent to the eastern arm of Dover harbour, and is easily visible from a public footpath up the cliffs nearby. Engines are towed there along the sea front, and the track along this route has been relaid and set in concrete. A 'P' class 0-6-0T is used for motive power, though it is rumoured that diesels may be used later. No. 31511 is said to have been cut up here in February, but confirmation is required. On 1st March 1951, the only thing visible in the yard which could be identified as part of a locomotive was a bunker with the number 31546 (from an 'H' class 0-4-4T) and this was being cut up by oxy-acetylene equipment. The 0-4-2T No. 2359, still outside Dover shed, is used as a stationary boiler. |
SLS/195104 |
31/07/1951 |
Southern Notes |
Standard 2-6-4T, 80010, was working in July Brighton-Victoria via Oxted. New diesel-electric 0-6-0 shunting engines numbered 15228-31 have been completed at Ashford where the big express locomotive with that method of propulsion, No. 10202 was nearly ready for trials at the end of July. There having presumably been no decision in her favour, the Stirling 4-4-0, 1231, which though condemned had been standing at Ashford Works for two years or so in case of possible preservation, has now gone to the scrap yard. Classes 'F1' & 'B1' are now extinct. Some of the rebuilt Wainwright 4-4-0's of classes 'D1' & 'E1' are to receive new parts and general overhaul. Though not so much in use on Kent coast fast trains now, they do good work with excursions on that route, sometimes with 9 or 10 corridor coaches starting from suburban stations in summer, as well as hauling the Holborn or Green-wich route slow passenger trains or semi-fasts which are a late night or early morning feature on the Eastern Section. Some of Adams's 'G6' & 'O2' tanks are also receiving general repair. The last Stroudley 'D' tank (0-4-2) No. 2359 which had been performing stationary boiler service at Dover was at Ashford condemned on 24th July. Green painting of 'Merchant Navy' engines in the very dark shade used at Eastleigh has commenced. 'King Arthurs' are supplementing the heavy and light 'Pacifics' in handling the Continental boat traffic to and from Folkestone and Dover during the holiday season. 'L' class 4-4-0's work through between Charing Cross and New Romney on summer Saturdays, traversing a single line from Appledore and running tender first one way on the branch, with fast runs west of Ashford via Tonbridge or Maidstone East. The veteran 'Terrier' 0-6-0T, 32670, which is nearly 80 years old, ran as a light engine from Headcorn to Ashford, St. Leonards, and so in stages to Brighton Works. The diminutive side tanks were green but plain, the semi-circular lettering 'K&ESR No. 3' having been painted out when a B.R. number was provided. No. 1602, the solitary 'T' class London, Chatham and Dover small 0-6-OT also passed along the coast line from St. Leonards on a roundabout last journey from Reading to Brighton shops. Atlantic 32426 St. Albans Head looked smart in 'L&NW' livery at Hastings on a holiday special ex-Birmingham formed of L.M.S. stock, often also working Newhaven boat specials. After a spell at Nine Elms on Waterloo express trials (with 70009), class '7' 4-6-2, 70014, Iron Duke, was at Stewarts Lane at the beginning of August and working on Folkestone or Dover boat trains. Class '4' 2-6-4T, 42093, hauled the 11.34 a.m. Ramsgate-Victoria semi-fast on 28th July, this is the return working of the 5.10 a.m. down slow from London. 'N' class 'Moguls' hauled several Kent coast trains via Tonbridge on 4th August. On that day the main Birkenhead-Ramsgate train loaded to 13 corridors, including Diner, was headed east of Redhill by 30913, Christs Hospital; like Nos. 30907 an 30917, this 'Schools' is still green. |
SLS/195109 |
27/07/1951 |
Classes extinct |
The withdrawal of 32037/8 (H1), 2002 (I1x), 2359 (D1), 389 (K10), and 1602 (T) renders their respective classes extinct. No. 1602 is particularly interesting as being the last of the Kirtley L.C.&D.R. locomotives in service: it was built at Longhedge in 1893, as No. 143, and but for the second World War would have been withdrawn in 1939: it was lately working from Reading shed. |
SLS/195109 |
08/10/1951 |
S.R. Corrections |
2359 is not the last Stroudley 'D' tank, as 701s is still in store at Nine Elms; in addition, 2357 is still in service on the County Mental Hospital Railway, Whittingham. Further, 1602 is not the last of the Kirtley L.C. & D.R. locomotives in service, as 1600 is still at work at Haydock Colliery, near St. Helens, and several of the class R tanks, 31658-75 are still running. |
SLS/195111 |