Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 15 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17818 Week
» 70834 Month
» 190361 Year
» 3217214 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2394 |
m/e |
04/1896 |
British Railways |
32394 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Bogie Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 04/1896 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1951 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1952 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2394 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Leonards (STL) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (TWW) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32394 |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (EBN) |
|
|
14/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
20/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
12/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32394 |
|
|
1952 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|