Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1479 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14885 Week
» 67901 Month
» 187428 Year
» 3214281 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2436 |
m/e |
03/1893 |
British Railways |
32436 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Small Vulcans |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
To Service |
During 03/1893 |
Withdrawal |
During 01/1950 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1893 |
3B |
|
Three Bridges |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
01/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
3Br |
Three Bridges |
on |
14/01/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1947 |
Brighton Works |
: No. 21C156 Croydon and 'Austerity' 77122 have just been through shops; the former has the new pattern cab and longer deflector plates. Engines in shops in mid-November were 21C126 (new deflectors and old cab-off 21C156), 21C170 Manston fully painted), 680S, 1414, 1826/80, 2022, 2039 Hartland Point, 2083/9, 2153, 2339/66, 2436/43/55/62/89/90, 2523/46/75. For the first time for many months the shops are without an 'Austerity' and old Brighton types preponderate. It is interesting to point out that the name Croydon was borne by Rennie's 0-4-2 of 1838 (London and Croydon Ry. No. 2), but apart from this engine-which became S.E.R. No. 2 as from 31/1/1846-three engines of this name have been seen on Brighton metals as follows: Craven's 2-2-2 No. 128 which was commenced by Dodds & Son of Rotherham in 1866 and finished off at Brighton Works in June, 1871, and named Croydon by Mr. Stroudley: scrapped in 1888. Stroudley's 0-4-2 No. 181, built at Brighton (estd. Works No. 463), completed early in 1890 by R. J. Billinton, and scrapped in 1929. Bulleid's 'West Country' Class No. 21C156, completed in February, 1947, and modified in November to the 'Battle of Britain' Class (estd. Works No. 1004). |
SLS/194712 |
04/05/1950 |
Horley MPD |
'K.10' No. 140 has joined the condemned locos. here. 'C.2' No. 2436 was still intact on 4/5/50, also 0.1 No. 1377. |
SLS/195006 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2436 Built at Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Three Bridges (3B ) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 32436 but not taken up |
|
|
01/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2436 |
|
|
05/1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|