Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 597 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14003 Week
» 67019 Month
» 186546 Year
» 3213399 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2451 |
m/e |
10/1894 |
British Railways |
32451 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Marsh |
Class |
Large Vulcans |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
To Service |
During 10/1894 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 11/11/1961 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 1 mth , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
75B |
Redhill |
3w/e |
10/10/1955 |
REINS |
75B |
Redhill |
q/e |
27/08/1956 |
ALLOC |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
6w/e |
06/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
11/11/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2451 Built at Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Three Bridges (3B ) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32451 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
06/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
11/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
11/11/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32451 |
|
|