Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 642 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18445 Week
» 71461 Month
» 190988 Year
» 3217841 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2479 |
m/e |
12/1898 |
British Railways |
32479 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1898 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 02/06/1963 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 6 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
71D |
Fratton |
7w/e |
21/01/1952 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
01/10/1953 |
REINS |
71D |
Fratton |
10w/e |
10/12/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
6w/e |
30/12/1953 |
REINS |
71D |
Fratton |
6w/e |
08/02/1954 |
TOSTORE |
70F |
Fratton |
9w/e |
31/10/1954 |
REINS |
70F |
Fratton |
7w/e |
19/12/1955 |
ALLOC |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
P |
26/11/1959 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
4w/e |
05/04/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/06/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
26/10/1951 |
Brighton Works |
New construction, 80021 well advanced, laid down to 80027, Under repair, DS1173, 377S, 15217, 20002, 31638, 31849, 31853, 32168, 32376, 32464, 32479, 42101. Being cut up, 32590. Waiting scrapping, 32075, 32021. Nos. 31849/53 bear R.O.F. Nos. 26 and 29 respectively. Recently ex shops: 80019 (20/10) for S.R.; 80020 (27/10) for Sc.R.; 31691 (26/10); 80013 and others of the class after attention to leaky tanks. An unusual visitor to Brighton shed is 30163 (L.11); 32347 with damaged front end is understood to be waiting decision as to repair or scrap. No. 41297 was on shed on 7th November. |
SLS/195112 |
29/12/1962 |
Southern Region |
On 29th December, Hove goods yard dump contained 30901/11/5/23, 32338/41/2, 32417/8/74/9 but owing to shortage of power 32474/9 were removed again early in January, 32479 going to Brighton and 32474 to Three Bridges where it has taken turns on the East Grinstead shuttle service in place of H Class engines (push/pull); as a lot of time was lost running round it is understood that M7s or standard 2-6-2Ts are to be provided to enable motor-working to be resumed. Although all 'withdrawn', some '700' class 0-6-0s are still in use on snowplough work and one was stuck in a snowdrift for several days near Meldon summit. 30306 was in steam at Guildford on 19th January. |
SLS/196302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2479 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32479 |
|
|
21/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
26/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
05/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
02/06/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32479 |
|
|
07/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|