Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 3153 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16559 Week
» 69575 Month
» 189102 Year
» 3215955 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2481 |
m/e |
12/1898 |
British Railways |
32481 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1898 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/04/1958 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2481 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
01/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32481 |
|
|
05/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
11/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
04/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32481 |
|
|