Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 32 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17835 Week
» 70851 Month
» 190378 Year
» 3217231 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2494 |
m/e |
11/1899 |
British Railways |
32494 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 11/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/09/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 10 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1899 |
NHN |
|
Newhaven |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
19/09/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
24/08/1953 |
REINS |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
10w/e |
10/12/1953 |
TOSTORE |
75ANHN |
|
6w/e |
30/12/1953 |
TOSTORE |
75ANHN |
|
8w/e |
08/02/1955 |
TOSTORE |
75ANHN |
|
5w/e |
12/08/1955 |
REINS |
75A |
Brighton |
5w/e |
16/09/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/09/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2494 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newhaven (NHN) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32494 |
|
|
09/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32494 |
|
|