Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4368 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17774 Week
» 70790 Month
» 190317 Year
» 3217170 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2503 |
m/e |
08/1900 |
British Railways |
32503 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 08/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 14/04/1963 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1900 |
TON |
|
Tonbridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
75A |
|
Brighton |
5w/e |
16/09/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
14/04/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
74D |
Tonbridge |
9w/e |
31/10/1954 |
REINS |
75A |
Brighton |
5w/e |
16/09/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/04/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/05/1963 |
Eastligh MPD (Waiting Works) |
Waiting Works: DS682, 30031/65/70/89, 30105/10/99, 30328, 30513/39, 30936, 31612, 31861/6, 31906/8/9, 32503, 33009, 34046/84, 35012, 76013/4. Ex Works: D6527, 31803/53, 35004, 82023. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2503 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32503 |
|
|
16/09/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
14/04/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32503 |
|
|
06/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|