Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 554 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19465 Week
» 84419 Month
» 287083 Year
» 3313936 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2514 |
m/e |
03/1901 |
British Railways |
32514 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 03/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/09/1956 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1956 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1901 |
BTN |
|
Brighton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
BTN |
|
Brighton |
P |
02/01/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
15/09/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BTN |
Brighton |
P |
02/01/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/09/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/01/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Locomotives in shops included:-Nos. 2039, 2325/39/51, S2376, 2514/20, S2578, 34004/15/56/64, 21C161/63, 'Austerity' 70853, 77062/90, 78597, while under construction were:-Nos. 34090, 36001 and tenders. No. 32029 which left shops on 1/1 with plain black tanks, came back to be fully-lined and was ex shops again on 5/1. 'British Railways' lettering on engines is cancelled. |
SLS/194902 |
01/02/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Engines in shops:-Nos. 21C101, CC2, 34004/05/20, 34061 73 Squadron, 34062/65, 2039/76/89, 2325, 2489, 2514, 32339, 32520 an 77062/94, for repair. Two 'Leader' Class under construction. No. 34090 left shops on 31/1 named Sir Eustace Missenden, Southern Railway Battle of Britain Class, the S.R. Coat-of-arms is also incorporated in the nameplate, the background of which is painted Air Force blue. The locomotive is painted malachite green with yellow lining, but the wheel centres instead of being black are also green and the tyres yellow. The British Railways crest is on the tender. |
SLS/194903 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2514 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
02/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32514 |
|
|
15/09/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32514 |
|
|
10/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|