Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4116 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17522 Week
» 70538 Month
» 190065 Year
» 3216918 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2528 |
m/e |
11/1900 |
British Railways |
32528 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Marsh |
Class |
Large Vulcans |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
To Service |
During 11/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/02/1961 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1900 |
BTN |
|
Brighton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
75E |
|
Three Bridges |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
25/02/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
25/02/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/10/1945 |
Ashford Works |
Locos noted on 27/10 included 0-4-0 Dock Tank 81, 'Jersey,' together with Terrier 2678, both ex-works. The latter has been on loan to. the KESR. 2528 (BTN), 2534 (NHN), 2023/5 (TWW) and 719 (BM) were outside the shed whilst 2072 (NX) was on a down passenger. 1451 with number still on the tender was station pilot. 22 classes in all were represented, excluding those outside the works. |
SLS/194602 |
22/11/1949 |
Brighton Works |
On 22/11 'Leader' Class No. 36001 was still running trial trips with empty coaches, but had not yet been handed over to the Running Dept. No. 36002 was stored in the Electric Car Sheds at Brighton. Locomotives in shops on 16/11 were: Nos. 2386, 32498, 2528, 32538, 2594, 2655, 77340, 90247, 90354, 90375 (78569). 90622/69 and Diesel No. 3. Some of the W.D. locomotives carry the new numbers on the cab side, but the old number on, the buffer beam has not yet been painted out. New 'W.C.' No. 34096 Trevone left the Works fully painted on 15/11 . |
SLS/194912 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2528 Built at Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32528 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32528 |
|
|
03/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|