Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3527 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16933 Week
» 69949 Month
» 189476 Year
» 3216329 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2537 |
m/e |
11/1900 |
British Railways |
32537 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Marsh |
Class |
Large Vulcans |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
To Service |
During 11/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 13/04/1957 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 5 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
HOR |
Horsham |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
NHN |
Newhaven |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
3w/e |
10/10/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
13/04/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2537 Built at Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Fratton (FRA) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32537 |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Horsham (HOR) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newhaven (NHN) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
10/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
13/04/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32537 |
|
|
05/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|