Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2197 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20000 Week
» 73016 Month
» 192543 Year
» 3219396 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2541 |
m/e |
12/1901 |
British Railways |
32541 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Marsh |
Class |
Large Vulcans |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
To Service |
During 12/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/01/1961 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
75D |
Horsham |
10w/e |
07/10/1952 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
6w/e |
18/11/1953 |
REINS |
75D |
Horsham |
5w/e |
16/09/1955 |
REINS |
75D |
Horsham |
8w/e |
05/06/1956 |
ALLOC |
75E |
Three Bridges |
5w/e |
18/07/1959 |
ALLOC |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
9w/e |
22/10/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/07/1959 |
Horsham MPD (Three Bridges) |
Horsham closed from 18th July and duties and engines shared between Brighton (30047/8/9/50/1) and Three Bridges (30544/5/6/7, 32463/9/70, 32522/6/41). Shunting is performed by a Guildford 350 H.P. Diesel. |
SLS/195909 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2541 Built at Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32541 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G) |
|
|
07/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Horsham (75D) |
|
|
18/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
22/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32541 |
|
|
02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|