Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 959 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18762 Week
» 71778 Month
» 191305 Year
» 3218158 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2552 |
m/e |
02/1902 |
British Railways |
32552 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Marsh |
Class |
Large Vulcans |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
To Service |
During 02/1902 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/06/1961 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
75B |
Redhill |
4w/e |
10/02/1961 |
ALLOC |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
P |
18/03/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/06/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2552 Built at Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Three Bridges (3B ) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32552 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
10/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
24/06/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32552 |
|
|
07/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|