Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3792 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17198 Week
» 70214 Month
» 189741 Year
» 3216594 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2581 |
m/e |
09/1903 |
British Railways |
32581 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 09/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Tue 17/04/1962 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2581 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tunbridge Wells West (TWW) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32581 |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
04/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
17/04/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32581 |
|
|