Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 184 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17987 Week
» 71003 Month
» 190530 Year
» 3217383 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2582 |
m/e |
09/1903 |
British Railways |
32582 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 09/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 29/10/1956 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1956 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1950 |
S.R. Renumbering |
By the re-numbering of Nos. 30494 an 32425 all existing engines in Classes G16 and H2 have been dealt with, while No. 30746 completes the 'Urie Arthurs.' (Incidentally according to our records 32437 was done in 10/48, 32558 in 5/48, 31841 in 11/49, and 32582 in 7/49). |
SLS/195012 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2582 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tunbridge Wells West (TWW) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32582 |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
14/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
20/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
29/10/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32582 |
|
|