Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 512 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14555 Week
» 79509 Month
» 282173 Year
» 3309026 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2593 |
m/e |
05/1904 |
British Railways |
32593 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Large Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 05/1904 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/01/1956 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1956 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2593 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Three Bridges (3B ) |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (EBN) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32593 |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
01/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
14/01/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32593 |
|
|