Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2550 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15956 Week
» 68972 Month
» 188499 Year
» 3215352 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
C14 |
m/e |
10/1942 |
British Railways |
33014 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
Q1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 05/01/1964 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1942 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number C14 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33014 |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
27/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J) |
|
|
10/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
05/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33014 |
|
|
06/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
10/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|