Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 760 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6160 Week
» 24212 Month
» 257132 Year
» 1922508 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) C18 m/e 04/1942
British Railways 33018 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Q1
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sun 04/07/1965
Service Life 23 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1942
ELH   Eastleigh on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74B   Ramsgate 6w/e 27/03/1953
70C   Guildford 4w/e 26/05/1953
73A   Stewarts Lane 8w/e 20/07/1953
70C   Guildford 5w/e 24/08/1953
73C   Hither Green 4w/e 01/10/1953
75C   Norwood Junction 8w/e 13/05/1954
70B   Feltham 4w/e 06/11/1954
75E   Three Bridges 4w/e 17/12/1962
70C   Guildford m/e 06/01/1964
70A   Nine Elms 4w/e 08/06/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 04/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate 3w/e 27/03/1953
ALLOC 70C Guildford 9w/e 26/05/1953
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 70C Guildford 5w/e 24/08/1953
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 8w/e 13/05/1954
ALLOC 70B Feltham 9w/e 31/10/1954
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges P 17/12/1962
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 29/12/1963
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 06/06/1965
WDN   w/e 04/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1942 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number C18
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 33018    
27/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
26/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
24/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
13/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
17/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
04/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 33018    
12/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev