Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 221 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3253 Week
» 21305 Month
» 254225 Year
» 1919601 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) C20 m/e 05/1942
British Railways 33020 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Q1
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/01/1966
Service Life 23 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1966

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1942
ELH   Eastleigh on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70B   Feltham 4w/e 22/06/1964
70C   Guildford w/e 20/11/1964
70A   Nine Elms 4w/e 08/06/1965
70C   Guildford 4w/e 22/11/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 09/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ELH Eastleigh 5w/e 11/08/1947
ALLOC 70B Feltham 8w/e 22/06/1964
ALLOC 70C Guildford 2w/e 20/11/1964
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 06/06/1965
ALLOC 70C Guildford P 22/11/1965
WDN   w/e 09/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/02/1962 Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) Works Yard: D2250, D6500/3/7, 15212, 30055, 30781, 30864, 33020, 34002/52, Erecting Shop: D3042, D3271, D3471, D5012/4, D6506/63, L.S.W.R. 120, 4694, 9667, 30045, 30515/42, 30838/43, 30955, 31795/8, 32646, 33039, 34011/18/24/66/72, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76005/19/63, 80010/65/6, 80139/41/51, 92239. Scrap Road: 30059, 30475/6, 30905, 31723. SLS/196204
25/02/1962 Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) Works Yard: D2250, D3042, D3271, D6500/3, 33020, 41324, 76025/9. Erecting Shop: D3471, D5012/4, D6506/7/14/63, E6002, L.S.W.R. 120, 15212, 30045, 30515/42/5, 30781, 30838/43, 30955, 31413, 31795/8, 32636/46, 33039, 34002/11/8/24/66, 35025, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76016/63, 80010, 80141/51, 92239. Behind Erecting Shop: 30059, 30475/6, 30692, 30864, 80064. SLS/196204
12/05/1963 Eastleigh Works (Test House) Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1942 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number C20
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 33020    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
20/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
22/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
09/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 33020    
09/1966 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev